This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/13/2020 at 06:48:22 (UTC).

ROSILEE GAMBOA VS. JIMMY L. HASTON

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 ROSILEE GAMBOA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JIMMY L HASTON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosilee Gamboa

Defendant

Jimmy L. Haston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter C. Wittlin

 

Court Documents

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/26/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/26/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GAMBOA, ROSILEE ON 08/13/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GAMBOA, ROSILEE ON 08/13/2020

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GAMBOA, ROSILEE ON 08/10/2020

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GAMBOA, ROSILEE ON 08/10/2020

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 07/01/2020.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 07/01/2020.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12755688 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12582027.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12755688 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12582027.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GAMBOA, ROSILEE ON 07/01/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GAMBOA, ROSILEE ON 07/01/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GAMBOA, ROSILEE ON 07/01/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GAMBOA, ROSILEE ON 07/01/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY GAMBOA, ROSILEE ON 07/01/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY GAMBOA, ROSILEE ON 07/01/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: GASTELUM; Department: C11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GASTELUM; Department: C11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/26/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GAMBOA, ROSILEE ON 08/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1759787 RECEIVED ON 08/13/2020 04:11:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GAMBOA, ROSILEE ON 08/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41104672 RECEIVED ON 08/10/2020 11:31:29 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12755688 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12582027.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3917128 RECEIVED ON 07/01/2020 11:58:41 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 07/01/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GAMBOA, ROSILEE ON 07/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GAMBOA, ROSILEE ON 07/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GAMBOA, ROSILEE ON 07/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter C. Wittlin