This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/10/2022 at 07:13:37 (UTC).

ROSALIND GIL VS. THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 ROSALIND GIL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosalind Gil

Others and Defendants

The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated

The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RMD Law, LLP

Other and Defendant Attorney

Manning & Kass Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY GIL, ROSALIND ON 01/26/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY GIL, ROSALIND ON 01/26/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GIL, ROSALIND ON 01/26/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GIL, ROSALIND ON 01/26/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GIL, ROSALIND ON 01/26/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GIL, ROSALIND ON 01/26/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13000359 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12828278.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13000359 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12828278.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GIL, ROSALIND ON 02/03/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GIL, ROSALIND ON 02/03/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GIL, ROSALIND ON 02/03/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GIL, ROSALIND ON 02/03/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,020.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13018914 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12846861.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,020.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13018914 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12846861.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED; THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS, INC. ON 03/08/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED; THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS, INC. ON 03/08/2022

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED; THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS, INC. ON 03/08/2022

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED; THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS, INC. ON 03/08/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED; THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS, INC. ON 03/08/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED; THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS, INC. ON 03/08/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED; THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS, INC. ON 03/08/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED; THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS, INC. ON 03/08/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED; THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS, INC. ON 03/08/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED; THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS, INC. ON 03/08/2022

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GOODING; Department: C31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21131685 RECEIVED ON 03/08/2022 09:33:40 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,020.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13018914 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12846861.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED; THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS, INC. ON 03/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED; THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS, INC. ON 03/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED; THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS, INC. ON 03/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED; THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS, INC. ON 03/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED; THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS, INC. ON 03/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1947853 RECEIVED ON 02/03/2022 03:52:53 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GIL, ROSALIND ON 02/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21118647 RECEIVED ON 02/03/2022 03:52:54 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GIL, ROSALIND ON 02/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21115200 RECEIVED ON 01/26/2022 03:30:43 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13000359 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12828278.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GIL, ROSALIND ON 01/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GIL, ROSALIND ON 01/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GIL, ROSALIND ON 01/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 01/26/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHEESECAKE FACTORY RESTAURANTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED is a litigant