This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:13:58 (UTC).

ROSALIE BACLET VS. JOHN EVANS

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 ROSALIE BACLET filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOHN EVANS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

MARGAWYN ELFMAN EVANS

MARGARET EVANS

JOHN EVANS

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 09/18/2013

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 09/18/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 08/12/2013

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2372508 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2372508 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 08/30/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 08/30/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 11/25/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 11/25/2014

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 01/10/2014

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 01/10/2014

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 11/30/2015

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 11/30/2015

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 09/17/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 09/17/2013

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 09/23/2013 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 09/23/2013 01:30:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11779521 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11603804.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11779521 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11603804.

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 08/30/2013

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 08/30/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 09/17/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 09/17/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND COURT JUDGMENT PACKAGE) FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 01/08/2014

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND COURT JUDGMENT PACKAGE) FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 01/08/2014

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4269916 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4269916 REJECTED.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 09/17/2013.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 09/17/2013.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 08/12/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 08/30/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 08/30/2013

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 11/30/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 05/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11779521 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11603804.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • WRIT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11702187 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11526490.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 11/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 12/05/2014) RECEIVED ON 11/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3220118 RECEIVED ON 11/25/2014 01:32:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4269916 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 10/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EVANS, JOHN REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES DENIED IN WHOLE ON 08/22/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY EVANS, MARGAWYN ELFMAN; EVANS, JOHN ON 08/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY EVANS, MARGAWYN ELFMAN ON 08/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY EVANS, JOHN ON 08/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY BACLET, ROSALIE ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2270711 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 02:11:09 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less