This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 04:48:23 (UTC).

RONNIE LYLES VS. STEVEN D. SILVERSTEIN

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 RONNIE LYLES filed an Other lawsuit against STEVEN D SILVERSTEIN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RONNIE LYLES

Defendants

OC INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC

NDEX WEST, LLC

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

STEVEN D. SILVERSTEIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

STEVEN D. SILVERSTEIN

ANGLIN FLEWELLING RASMUSSEN CAMPBELL & TRYTTEN LLP

STEVEN D SILVERSTEIN

Other Attorneys

ANGLIN FLEWELLING RASMUSSEN CAMPBELL &

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12277677 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12101417.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12277677 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12101417.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY OC INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC; SILVERSTEIN, STEVEN D. ON 01/04/2018

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY OC INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC; SILVERSTEIN, STEVEN D. ON 01/04/2018

MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY OC INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC; SILVERSTEIN, STEVEN D. ON 01/04/2018

MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY OC INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC; SILVERSTEIN, STEVEN D. ON 01/04/2018

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/27/2017 12:02:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/27/2017 12:02:00 PM.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 09/29/2017

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 09/29/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY OC INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC ON 09/14/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY OC INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC ON 09/14/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SILVERSTEIN, STEVEN D. ON 09/14/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SILVERSTEIN, STEVEN D. ON 09/14/2017

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 09/11/2017

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 09/11/2017

ORDER - OTHER (FOR THE EXPUNGEMENT OF DEED OF TRUST) RECEIVED ON 08/30/2017.

ORDER - OTHER (FOR THE EXPUNGEMENT OF DEED OF TRUST) RECEIVED ON 08/30/2017.

ORDER - OTHER RECEIVED ON 08/30/2017.

ORDER - OTHER RECEIVED ON 08/30/2017.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 08/28/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 08/28/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/24/2017 11:18:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/24/2017 11:18:00 AM.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 08/16/2017

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 08/16/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12202851 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12026571.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12202851 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12026571.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12200539 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12024276.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12200539 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12024276.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY SILVERSTEIN, STEVEN D. ON 08/07/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY SILVERSTEIN, STEVEN D. ON 08/07/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 01/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3626849 RECEIVED ON 01/17/2018 04:05:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/16/2018 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • MOTION TO DISMISS SCHEDULED FOR 02/09/2018 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12277677 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12101417.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY OC INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC; SILVERSTEIN, STEVEN D. ON 01/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3574008 RECEIVED ON 08/07/2017 11:08:22 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/06/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • LYLES, RONNIE REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 06/07/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY LYLES, RONNIE ON 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 06/05/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LYLES, RONNIE ON 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LYLES, RONNIE ON 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY LYLES, RONNIE ON 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OC INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC AS TRUSTEE OF THE CANYON TRUST NO. 28022 DATED is a litigant

Latest cases where NDEX WEST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant