This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/26/2021 at 06:45:49 (UTC).

ROMAN LIBONAO VS. STATEBRIDGE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 ROMAN LIBONAO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against STATEBRIDGE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roman Libonao

Defendants

Statebridge Company

ZBS Law

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY LIBONAO, ROMAN ON 10/13/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY LIBONAO, ROMAN ON 10/13/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LIBONAO, ROMAN ON 10/13/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LIBONAO, ROMAN ON 10/13/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LIBONAO, ROMAN ON 10/13/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LIBONAO, ROMAN ON 10/13/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/18/2022 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/18/2022 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 10/13/2021.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 10/13/2021.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/18/2021

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/18/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GRIFFIN; Department: N17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketLIBONAO, ROMAN REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 10/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/18/2022 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41251770 RECEIVED ON 10/13/2021 02:08:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 10/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 10/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LIBONAO, ROMAN ON 10/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY LIBONAO, ROMAN ON 10/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LIBONAO, ROMAN ON 10/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY LIBONAO, ROMAN ON 10/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATEBRIDGE COMPANY LLC is a litigant