This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/31/2020 at 20:03:27 (UTC).

ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION VS. ANA PATINO

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANA PATINO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CORPORATI

Defendant

ANA PATINO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION ON 01/16/2020; Filing Party: ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 01/16/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION ON 12/10/2019; Filing Party: ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION ON 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ROGERS ACCEPTANCE CORP. FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12661570 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12486251.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/16/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C62 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION ON 11/18/2019; Filing Party: ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION ON 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.