This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 06:44:29 (UTC).

RODNEY THOMPSON VS. ORANGE COAST MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 RODNEY THOMPSON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ORANGE COAST MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodney Thompson

Defendants

Integra Lifesciences Corporation

Orange Coast Medical Center

Orange Coast Memorial Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

National Choice Lawyers

Defendant Attorneys

Bowman and Brooke LLP

La Follette, Johnson, DeHaas, Fesler & Ames

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY THOMPSON, RODNEY ON 10/22/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY THOMPSON, RODNEY ON 10/22/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THOMPSON, RODNEY ON 10/22/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THOMPSON, RODNEY ON 10/22/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THOMPSON, RODNEY ON 10/22/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THOMPSON, RODNEY ON 10/22/2021

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 10/22/2021.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 10/22/2021.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/07/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/07/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/26/2021

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/26/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/27/2021 03:16:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/27/2021 03:16:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/14/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/14/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/14/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/14/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12982659 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12810580.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12982659 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12810580.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THOMPSON, RODNEY ON 12/22/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THOMPSON, RODNEY ON 12/22/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/27/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/27/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION ON 12/29/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION ON 12/29/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12988579 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12816518.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12988579 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12816518.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION ON 12/29/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION ON 12/29/2021

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MCCORMICK; Department: C13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION ON 12/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21104616 RECEIVED ON 12/29/2021 11:44:40 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12988579 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12816518.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION ON 12/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1933774 RECEIVED ON 12/29/2021 11:44:38 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 12/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31101122 RECEIVED ON 12/27/2021 09:31:02 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THOMPSON, RODNEY ON 12/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31100130 RECEIVED ON 12/22/2021 08:10:59 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketTHOMPSON, RODNEY REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 10/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/07/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31077616 RECEIVED ON 10/22/2021 02:43:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 10/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY THOMPSON, RODNEY ON 10/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 10/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY THOMPSON, RODNEY ON 10/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY THOMPSON, RODNEY ON 10/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY THOMPSON, RODNEY ON 10/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTEGRA LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ORANGE COAST MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION; COMMUNITY HOSPITAL OF LONG BEACH A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION; is a litigant