This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 03:54:04 (UTC).

RODERICK LANE VS. CITY OF BUENA PARK

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 RODERICK LANE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF BUENA PARK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roderick Lane

Defendants

City of Buena Park

Orange County Water District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allen Flatt Ballidis & Leslie

Defendant Attorney

Everett Dorey LLP

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/27/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/27/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13077830 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12905832.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13077830 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12905832.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 07/15/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 07/15/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 07/15/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 07/15/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 07/15/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 07/15/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 08/26/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 08/26/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 08/26/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 08/26/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF BUENA PARK ON 09/22/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF BUENA PARK ON 09/22/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/21/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/21/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 10/21/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 10/21/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13125332 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12953397.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13125332 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12953397.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 10/21/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 10/21/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 12/12/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 12/12/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF BUENA PARK ON 12/13/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF BUENA PARK ON 12/13/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/27/2022 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/27/2022 10:00:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/05/2023

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/05/2023

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2024
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: MARKS; Department: CX102

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/05/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/27/2022 10:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketTHE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/13/2024 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C25.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF BUENA PARK ON 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41422409 RECEIVED ON 12/13/2022 12:04:14 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 12/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21246433 RECEIVED ON 12/12/2022 04:45:10 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 10/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41377640 RECEIVED ON 08/26/2022 04:20:31 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 08/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21202029 RECEIVED ON 08/26/2022 04:20:31 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/27/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 07/15/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13077830 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12905832.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 07/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 07/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY LANE, RODERICK ON 07/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31181440 RECEIVED ON 07/15/2022 10:57:41 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Orange County Water District is a litigant