This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/23/2023 at 03:45:41 (UTC).

ROD JUNG VS. DIRECTV, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/08/2023 ROD JUNG filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DIRECTV, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rod Jung

Defendant

DIRECTV, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Diversity Law Group

Hyun Legal, APC

Law Offices of Choi & Associates, APLC

Polaris Law Group LLP

Defendant Attorney

Paul Hastings LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY JUNG, ROD ON 02/08/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY JUNG, ROD ON 02/08/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JUNG, ROD ON 02/08/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JUNG, ROD ON 02/08/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JUNG, ROD ON 02/08/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JUNG, ROD ON 02/08/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13177314 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13005420.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13177314 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13005420.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY JUNG, ROD ON 02/14/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY JUNG, ROD ON 02/14/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DIRECTV, LLC ON 03/28/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DIRECTV, LLC ON 03/28/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13200953 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13029060.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13200953 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13029060.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/07/2023 03:16:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/07/2023 03:16:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE - OTHER (OF MINUTE ORDER) FILED BY JUNG, ROD ON 04/10/2023

NOTICE - OTHER (OF MINUTE ORDER) FILED BY JUNG, ROD ON 04/10/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SHERMAN; Department: CX105

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (OF MINUTE ORDER) FILED BY JUNG, ROD ON 04/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41472722 RECEIVED ON 04/10/2023 02:08:22 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/07/2023 03:16:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 07/07/2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX105.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13200953 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13029060.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11120530 RECEIVED ON 03/28/2023 04:18:08 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DIRECTV, LLC ON 03/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY JUNG, ROD ON 02/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31268816 RECEIVED ON 02/13/2023 08:54:44 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13177314 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13005420.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11099338 RECEIVED ON 02/08/2023 11:45:23 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SHERMAN, RANDALL ON 02/08/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JUNG, ROD ON 02/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JUNG, ROD ON 02/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY JUNG, ROD ON 02/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less