This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/15/2022 at 11:33:44 (UTC).

ROCKVIEW DAIRIES INC. VS. SHAUN TUCKER

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 ROCKVIEW DAIRIES INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHAUN TUCKER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rockview Dairies Inc.

BCJ Corporation

Defendants

Justina Kung

Shaun Tucker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Office of Richard Meaglia

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY ROCKVIEW DAIRIES INC.; BCJ CORPORATION ON 04/21/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY ROCKVIEW DAIRIES INC.; BCJ CORPORATION ON 04/21/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROCKVIEW DAIRIES INC.; BCJ CORPORATION ON 04/21/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROCKVIEW DAIRIES INC.; BCJ CORPORATION ON 04/21/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROCKVIEW DAIRIES INC.; BCJ CORPORATION ON 04/21/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROCKVIEW DAIRIES INC.; BCJ CORPORATION ON 04/21/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12876640 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12704379.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12876640 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12704379.

STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/07/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/07/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY BCJ CORPORATION; ROCKVIEW DAIRIES INC. ON 12/30/2021

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY BCJ CORPORATION; ROCKVIEW DAIRIES INC. ON 12/30/2021

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 06/08/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 06/08/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ROCKVIEW DAIRIES INC. ON 01/05/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ROCKVIEW DAIRIES INC. ON 01/05/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21106893 RECEIVED ON 01/05/2022 06:21:17 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ROCKVIEW DAIRIES INC. ON 01/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 06/08/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31102653 RECEIVED ON 12/30/2021 03:18:19 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY BCJ CORPORATION; ROCKVIEW DAIRIES INC. ON 12/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/07/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12876640 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12704379.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41184475 RECEIVED ON 04/21/2021 03:34:17 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROCKVIEW DAIRIES INC.; BCJ CORPORATION ON 04/21/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROCKVIEW DAIRIES INC.; BCJ CORPORATION ON 04/21/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ROCKVIEW DAIRIES INC.; BCJ CORPORATION ON 04/21/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less