This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:23:40 (UTC).

ROCHELLE FURSE VS. WILLIAM E. WEDMORE

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 ROCHELLE FURSE filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against WILLIAM E WEDMORE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROCHELLE FURSE

Defendants

WILLIAM E. WEDMORE

PICKFORD REAL ESTATE, INC.

WILLIAM E. BILL WEDMORE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DARRYL J. PAUL

Defendant Attorney

OBRAND LAW GROUP, APC

 

Court Documents

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY WEDMORE, WILLIAM E.; PICKFORD REAL ESTATE, INC. ON 11/06/2013

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY WEDMORE, WILLIAM E.; PICKFORD REAL ESTATE, INC. ON 11/06/2013

MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY WEDMORE, WILLIAM E.; PICKFORD REAL ESTATE, INC. ON 10/15/2013

MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY WEDMORE, WILLIAM E.; PICKFORD REAL ESTATE, INC. ON 10/15/2013

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 06/25/2014

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 06/25/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/12/2013 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/12/2013 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 11/25/2013

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 11/25/2013

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HORN, FREDERICK ON 08/12/2013.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HORN, FREDERICK ON 08/12/2013.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 900.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11479229 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11303141.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 900.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11479229 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11303141.

NOTICE OF HEARING (CMC) FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 10/21/2013

NOTICE OF HEARING (CMC) FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 10/21/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11502228 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11326008.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11502228 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11326008.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 08/12/2013

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11506861 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11330646.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11506861 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11330646.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 08/12/2013

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE 02/19/2014 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE 02/19/2014 01:30:00 PM.

COMPLAINT FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 08/12/2013

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/16/2014 02:59:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/16/2014 02:59:00 PM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 10/14/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 10/14/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 11/25/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 11/25/2013

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 10/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3202296 RECEIVED ON 10/14/2014 03:50:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/16/2014 02:59:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE GREGORY H. LEWIS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO GREGORY LEWIS EFFECTIVE 09/16/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 06/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3159865 RECEIVED ON 06/25/2014 09:12:43 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY WEDMORE, WILLIAM E.; PICKFORD REAL ESTATE, INC. ON 10/15/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2287347 RECEIVED ON 10/15/2013 09:35:24 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/12/2013 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HORN, FREDERICK ON 08/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430726 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254598.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY FURSE, ROCHELLE ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2270525 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 09:25:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less