This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/25/2019 at 12:12:03 (UTC).

ROBLES V ROBLES

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 ROBLES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROBLES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SYKES, DAPHNE G.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7531

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

SYKES, DAPHNE G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fermin S. Robles

Petitioner

ROBLES, FERMIN S

Defendant

Maria G. Robles

Respondent

ROBLES, MARIA GUADALUPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cory A. Aguirre

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2015
  • WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 12/01/2015; Filing Party: ROBLES, MARIA GUADALUPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 11/23/2015; Filing Party: ROBLES, FERMIN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 11/12/2015 09:10:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: ROBLES, FERMIN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 11/12/2015 09:11:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: ROBLES, FERMIN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • JUDGMENT 11/12/2015 07:55:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: ROBLES, FERMIN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • MINUTE ORDER 11/12/2015 10:30:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • JUDGMENT - CONTESTED 11/12/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/17/2015 07:14:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: ROBLES, FERMIN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • TRIAL - HEARING BRIEF 07/15/2015 11:35:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: ROBLES, FERMIN S

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/17/2013 11:43:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: ROBLES, MARIA GUADALUPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 09/17/2013 11:42:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: ROBLES, MARIA GUADALUPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 09/17/2013 11:41:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: ROBLES, MARIA GUADALUPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 09/13/2013 13:53:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: ROBLES, FERMIN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 09/13/2013 13:53:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: ROBLES, FERMIN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/12/2013 11:15:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: ROBLES, FERMIN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION 08/12/2013 11:15:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: ROBLES, FERMIN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION 08/12/2013 11:15:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: ROBLES, FERMIN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SUMMONS 08/12/2013 11:15:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: ROBLES, FERMIN S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 08/12/2013 11:14:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: ROBLES, FERMIN S

    Read MoreRead Less