This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:27:55 (UTC).

ROBISON D HARLEY VS. CLIFFORD J FORD

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ROBISON D HARLEY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CLIFFORD J FORD. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBISON D HARLEY

Defendant

CLIFFORD J FORD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 05/26/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY HARLEY, ROBISON D ON 04/21/2016; Filing Party: HARLEY, ROBISON D ON 04/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY HARLEY, ROBISON D JR FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927343 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751568.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/26/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY HARLEY, ROBISON D ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: HARLEY, ROBISON D ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.