This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 19:06:22 (UTC).

ROBERT O'GRADY VS. TOWN & COUNTRY

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 ROBERT O'GRADY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TOWN COUNTRY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robert O'Grady

Ruth O'Grady

Defendants and Respondents

2210 Santa Ana OPCO, LLC

Advanced Rehab Center of Tustin

Jadeite Management, LLC

Town & Country

Town & Country Manor of the Christian and Missionary Alliance

TOWN & COUNTRY MANOR OF THE CHRISTIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moran Law

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

Clausen Miller P.C.

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC ON 10/20/2022

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC ON 10/20/2022

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY TOWN & COUNTRY MANOR OF THE CHRISTIAN AND MISSIONARY ALLIANCE ON 10/18/2022

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY TOWN & COUNTRY MANOR OF THE CHRISTIAN AND MISSIONARY ALLIANCE ON 10/18/2022

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY O'GRADY, RUTH; O'GRADY, ROBERT ON 09/14/2022

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY O'GRADY, RUTH; O'GRADY, ROBERT ON 09/14/2022

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY TOWN & COUNTRY; TOWN & COUNTRY MANOR OF THE CHRISTIAN AND MISSIONARY ALLIANCE; ADVANCED REHAB CENTER OF TUSTIN; 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC; JADEITE MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 08/26/2022

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY TOWN & COUNTRY; TOWN & COUNTRY MANOR OF THE CHRISTIAN AND MISSIONARY ALLIANCE; ADVANCED REHAB CENTER OF TUSTIN; 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC; JADEITE MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 08/26/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/25/2022 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/25/2022 10:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY TOWN & COUNTRY MANOR OF THE CHRISTIAN AND MISSIONARY ALLIANCE ON 08/18/2022

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY TOWN & COUNTRY MANOR OF THE CHRISTIAN AND MISSIONARY ALLIANCE ON 08/18/2022

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC ON 08/18/2022

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC ON 08/18/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC ON 08/18/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC ON 08/18/2022

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC ON 08/18/2022

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC ON 08/18/2022

OPPOSITION FILED BY O'GRADY, ROBERT; O'GRADY, RUTH ON 08/11/2022

OPPOSITION FILED BY O'GRADY, ROBERT; O'GRADY, RUTH ON 08/11/2022

OPPOSITION FILED BY O'GRADY, ROBERT; O'GRADY, RUTH ON 08/11/2022

OPPOSITION FILED BY O'GRADY, ROBERT; O'GRADY, RUTH ON 08/11/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/11/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/11/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/11/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/11/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/29/2022 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/29/2022 09:00:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/14/2022 03:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/14/2022 03:00:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/13/2022 04:16:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/13/2022 04:16:00 PM.

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2023
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: CRANDALL; Department: C33

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: CRANDALL; Department: C33

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41400277 RECEIVED ON 10/20/2022 11:33:20 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11052803 RECEIVED ON 10/18/2022 10:07:31 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC ON 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY TOWN & COUNTRY MANOR OF THE CHRISTIAN AND MISSIONARY ALLIANCE ON 10/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21209530 RECEIVED ON 09/14/2022 06:14:16 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY O'GRADY, RUTH; O'GRADY, ROBERT ON 09/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING FILED BY TOWN & COUNTRY; TOWN & COUNTRY MANOR OF THE CHRISTIAN AND MISSIONARY ALLIANCE; ADVANCED REHAB CENTER OF TUSTIN; 2210 SANTA ANA OPCO, LLC; JADEITE MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 08/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41377287 RECEIVED ON 08/26/2022 10:45:26 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21124298 RECEIVED ON 02/17/2022 03:57:57 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/15/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12991131 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12819050.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21106888 RECEIVED ON 01/05/2022 06:00:19 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GEORGE, STEPHANIE ON 01/05/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY O'GRADY, ROBERT; O'GRADY, RUTH ON 01/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY O'GRADY, ROBERT; O'GRADY, RUTH ON 01/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY O'GRADY, ROBERT; O'GRADY, RUTH ON 01/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY O'GRADY, ROBERT; O'GRADY, RUTH ON 01/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY O'GRADY, ROBERT; O'GRADY, RUTH ON 01/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less