This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 07:23:20 (UTC).

ROBERT NIGG VS. CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF REAL ESTATE

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 ROBERT NIGG filed an Other lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF REAL ESTATE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Robert Nigg

Respondent

California Department of Real Estate

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Anna Barsegyan

BRIAN D WESLEY

Xavier Becerra

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 2021-12-06 11:24:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 2021-12-06 11:24:00.0.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/19/2021 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/19/2021 01:30:00 PM.

OPPOSITION FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF REAL ESTATE ON 11/05/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF REAL ESTATE ON 11/05/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF REAL ESTATE ON 11/05/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF REAL ESTATE ON 11/05/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE (TRIAL BRIEF) FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 11/02/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE (TRIAL BRIEF) FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 11/02/2021

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 11/02/2021

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 11/02/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 10/22/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 10/22/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NIGG, ROBERT JAMES FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12960649 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12788570.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NIGG, ROBERT JAMES FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12960649 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12788570.

MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 10/21/2021

MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 10/21/2021

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF REAL ESTATE ON 09/29/2021

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF REAL ESTATE ON 09/29/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/20/2021 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/20/2021 08:30:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF REAL ESTATE ON 09/07/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF REAL ESTATE ON 09/07/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 09/03/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 09/03/2021

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/02/2021

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/02/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/25/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/25/2021

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 2021-12-06 11:24:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/19/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketTHE COURT TAKES THIS MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSITION FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF REAL ESTATE ON 11/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21086068 RECEIVED ON 11/05/2021 01:11:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSITION FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF REAL ESTATE ON 11/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31083256 RECEIVED ON 11/05/2021 01:08:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF ESERVICE (TRIAL BRIEF) FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 11/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 01/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 11/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 11/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 11/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 10/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY NIGG, ROBERT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12793278 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12620237.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 09/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE FILED BY NIGG, ROBERT ON 09/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Dept. of Real Estate Broker is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WESLEY BRIAN D. DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARSEGYAN, ANNA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Xavier Becerra