This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:19:10 (UTC).

ROBERT MOSBAUGH VS WENDY MOSBAUGH

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 ROBERT MOSBAUGH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WENDY MOSBAUGH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8284

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MOSBAUGH, ROBERT

Respondent

MOSBAUGH, WENDY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2018
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 05/07/2018; Filing Party: MOSBAUGH, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 05/07/2018; Filing Party: MOSBAUGH, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 05/07/2018; Filing Party: MOSBAUGH, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 05/07/2018; Filing Party: MOSBAUGH, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/07/2018; Filing Party: MOSBAUGH, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 02/15/2018 PRELIMINARY; Filing Party: MOSBAUGH, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 02/15/2018; Filing Party: MOSBAUGH, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/24/2018 PRELIMINARY; Filing Party: MOSBAUGH, WENDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 11/20/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: MOSBAUGH, WENDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 11/20/2017; Filing Party: MOSBAUGH, WENDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 11/20/2017; Filing Party: MOSBAUGH, WENDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 11/20/2017; Filing Party: MOSBAUGH, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 11/20/2017; Filing Party: MOSBAUGH, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 11/13/2017; Filing Party: MOSBAUGH, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/10/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: MOSBAUGH, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: MOSBAUGH, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • SUMMONS 10/10/2017; Filing Party: MOSBAUGH, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.