This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/15/2021 at 06:41:31 (UTC).

ROBERT MADDEN VS. PHILIP MCCASKEY

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 ROBERT MADDEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PHILIP MCCASKEY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robert Madden

Sladjana Rakich

Defendants

Shelley Black

Philip McCaskey

Mary McCaskey

Pickford Real Estate, Inc.

Veranda Realty

Ralph Balo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tomassian, Throckmorton, Inouye & Grigorian LLP

Defendant Attorneys

Bornhoft & Berkenstadt

Obrand Law Group, APC

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12927506 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12755367.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12927506 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12755367.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MCCASKEY, PHILIP; MCCASKEY, MARY ON 08/10/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MCCASKEY, PHILIP; MCCASKEY, MARY ON 08/10/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/28/2021 10:43:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/28/2021 10:43:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/21/2021 03:49:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/21/2021 03:49:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12913980 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12741852.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12913980 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12741852.

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. DEREK HUNT) FILED BY PICKFORD REAL ESTATE, INC.; BALO, RALPH ON 07/15/2021

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. DEREK HUNT) FILED BY PICKFORD REAL ESTATE, INC.; BALO, RALPH ON 07/15/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/22/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/22/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12894744 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12722539.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12894744 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12722539.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MADDEN, ROBERT; RAKICH, SLADJANA ON 06/02/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MADDEN, ROBERT; RAKICH, SLADJANA ON 06/02/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MADDEN, ROBERT; RAKICH, SLADJANA ON 06/02/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MADDEN, ROBERT; RAKICH, SLADJANA ON 06/02/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MADDEN, ROBERT; RAKICH, SLADJANA ON 06/02/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MADDEN, ROBERT; RAKICH, SLADJANA ON 06/02/2021

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOWARD; Department: C18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12927506 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12755367.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MCCASKEY, PHILIP; MCCASKEY, MARY ON 08/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41226828 RECEIVED ON 08/10/2021 11:09:18 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/28/2021 10:43:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 12/03/2021 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/03/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE REASSIGNED TO C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 11/22/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12913980 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12741852.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. DEREK HUNT) FILED BY PICKFORD REAL ESTATE, INC.; BALO, RALPH ON 07/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1870840 RECEIVED ON 07/15/2021 01:58:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/22/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12894744 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12722539.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41200594 RECEIVED ON 06/02/2021 04:15:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 06/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MADDEN, ROBERT; RAKICH, SLADJANA ON 06/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MADDEN, ROBERT; RAKICH, SLADJANA ON 06/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MADDEN, ROBERT; RAKICH, SLADJANA ON 06/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pickford Real Estate , INC; DBA : Berkshire Hathaway Homeservices California Properties is a litigant