This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:19:26 (UTC).

ROBERT GONZALEZ VS KIMBERLY RICE

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 ROBERT GONZALEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KIMBERLY RICE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8270

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GONZALEZ, ROBERT

Respondent

RICE, KIMBERLY A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2017
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 12/29/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - DEFAULT 12/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 11/22/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 10/16/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 10/16/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/10/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • SUMMONS 10/10/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 10/10/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 10/10/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.