This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 03:37:53 (UTC).

ROBERT EDWARD TIERNEY VS. OSCAR RIVAS ALVARADO

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 ROBERT EDWARD TIERNEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OSCAR RIVAS ALVARADO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Edward Tierney

Defendants

Oscar Rivas Alvarado

Covarrubias Bros. Construction, Inc.

Noel Ramos Barboza

Tovey/ Shultz Construction, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peacock & Le Beau

Defendant Attorney

Klinedinst PC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY TIERNEY, ROBERT EDWARD ON 09/04/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY TIERNEY, ROBERT EDWARD ON 09/04/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TIERNEY, ROBERT EDWARD ON 09/04/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TIERNEY, ROBERT EDWARD ON 09/04/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TIERNEY, ROBERT EDWARD ON 09/04/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TIERNEY, ROBERT EDWARD ON 09/04/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12777521 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12604216.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12777521 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12604216.

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY TIERNEY, ROBERT EDWARD ON 10/05/2020

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY TIERNEY, ROBERT EDWARD ON 10/05/2020

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/02/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/02/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NOEL RAMOS BARBOZA ON 10/06/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NOEL RAMOS BARBOZA ON 10/06/2020

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY NOEL RAMOS BARBOZA ON 10/06/2020

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY NOEL RAMOS BARBOZA ON 10/06/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12792069 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12619030.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12792069 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12619030.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY NOEL RAMOS BARBOZA ON 12/07/2020

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY NOEL RAMOS BARBOZA ON 12/07/2020

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 04/06/2021

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 04/06/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY TIERNEY, ROBERT EDWARD ON 11/10/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY TIERNEY, ROBERT EDWARD ON 11/10/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) FILED BY TIERNEY, ROBERT EDWARD ON 11/10/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) FILED BY TIERNEY, ROBERT EDWARD ON 11/10/2021

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/03/2022

HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: MOSS; Department: C14

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2022

HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MOSS; Department: C14

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) FILED BY TIERNEY, ROBERT EDWARD ON 11/10/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY TIERNEY, ROBERT EDWARD ON 11/10/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2021

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41262989 RECEIVED ON 11/10/2021 12:03:00 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2021

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41178347 RECEIVED ON 04/06/2021 04:15:21 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 04/06/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY NOEL RAMOS BARBOZA ON 12/07/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2020

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41138792 RECEIVED ON 12/07/2020 11:05:54 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12792069 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12619030.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
10/05/2020
View Court Documents

DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/02/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY TIERNEY, ROBERT EDWARD ON 10/05/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2020

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1774284 RECEIVED ON 10/05/2020 12:25:36 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2020

DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOSS, ROBERT ON 09/04/2020.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12777521 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12604216.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TIERNEY, ROBERT EDWARD ON 09/04/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TIERNEY, ROBERT EDWARD ON 09/04/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY TIERNEY, ROBERT EDWARD ON 09/04/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2020

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1765814 RECEIVED ON 09/04/2020 11:13:52 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less