This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/12/2022 at 10:29:02 (UTC).

ROBERT DRENK VS STACY DRENK

Case Summary

On 05/26/2016 ROBERT DRENK filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STACY DRENK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DE LA CRUZ, ANDRE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4654

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

DE LA CRUZ, ANDRE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DRENK, ROBERT A

Respondent

DRENK, STACY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

MINYARD MORRIS

Other Attorneys

WISHART, BRETT RYAN

 

Court Documents

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/26/2016 Amount:$435.00

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/26/2016 Amount:$435.00

SUMMONS 05/26/2016

SUMMONS 05/26/2016

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 05/26/2016

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 05/26/2016

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/26/2016

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/26/2016

RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 06/10/2016 Amount:$435.00

RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 06/10/2016 Amount:$435.00

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/10/2016

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/10/2016

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 06/10/2016

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 06/10/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 06/30/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 06/30/2016

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/01/2016

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/01/2016

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/30/2016

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/30/2016

RETURN SHEET - EXPEDITED JUDGMENT 10/07/2016

RETURN SHEET - EXPEDITED JUDGMENT 10/07/2016

STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 10/04/2016

STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 10/04/2016

WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/04/2016

WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/04/2016

DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 10/04/2016

DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 10/04/2016

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 10/17/2016

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 10/17/2016

NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 10/17/2016

NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 10/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 10/21/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 10/21/2016

WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 11/15/2016

WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 11/15/2016

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 03/05/2021 Ntc of Withdrawal of Attorney; Filing Party: DRENK, ROBERT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - RFO - MODIFICATION CUSTODY / VISITATION / SUPPORT; Department: W10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketHEARING - RFO - MODIFICATION CUSTODY / VISITATION / SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER 11/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION & ORDER 10/23/2020 Re: Custody and Support; Filing Party: DRENK, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 09/23/2020 Substitution Of Attorney; Filing Party: DRENK, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - RFO - MODIFICATION CUSTODY / VISITATION / SUPPORT; Department: W10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketHEARING - RFO - MODIFICATION CUSTODY / VISITATION / SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER 08/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - CONTINUANCE 08/24/2020 Notice - Continuance; Filing Party: DRENK, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/30/2016; Filing Party: DRENK, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/01/2016; Filing Party: DRENK, ROBERT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 06/30/2016; Filing Party: DRENK, ROBERT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 06/10/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: DRENK, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/10/2016; Filing Party: DRENK, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 06/10/2016; Filing Party: DRENK, STACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: DRENK, ROBERT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 05/26/2016; Filing Party: DRENK, ROBERT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 05/26/2016; Filing Party: DRENK, ROBERT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/26/2016; Filing Party: DRENK, ROBERT A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WISHART BRETT RYAN