This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 05:46:22 (UTC).

ROBERT ALLEN FIEDLER VS. CHRISTOPHER DESTEFANO

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 ROBERT ALLEN FIEDLER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER DESTEFANO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Allen Fiedler

Defendants

Yardi Systems, Inc.

Christopher Destefano

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

N Alex Lopez

Steve Vartazarian

The Vartazarian Law Firm

Defendant Attorneys

Law Offices of Richard E. Bishop

Liebman, Quigley & Sheppard

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/23/2021 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/23/2021 09:30:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DESTEFANO, CHRISTOPHER ON 07/22/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DESTEFANO, CHRISTOPHER ON 07/22/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FIEDLER, ROBERT ALLEN ON 07/08/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FIEDLER, ROBERT ALLEN ON 07/08/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY YARDI SYSTEMS, INC. ON 07/08/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY YARDI SYSTEMS, INC. ON 07/08/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12895528 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12723327.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12895528 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12723327.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DESTEFANO, CHRISTOPHER ON 05/21/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DESTEFANO, CHRISTOPHER ON 05/21/2021

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DESTEFANO, CHRISTOPHER ON 05/21/2021

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DESTEFANO, CHRISTOPHER ON 05/21/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FIEDLER, ROBERT ALLEN ON 05/05/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FIEDLER, ROBERT ALLEN ON 05/05/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/16/2021 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/16/2021 09:30:00 AM.

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY FIEDLER, ROBERT ALLEN ON 04/13/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY FIEDLER, ROBERT ALLEN ON 04/13/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY FIEDLER, ROBERT ALLEN ON 04/13/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY FIEDLER, ROBERT ALLEN ON 04/13/2021

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY YARDI SYSTEMS, INC. ON 04/01/2021

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY YARDI SYSTEMS, INC. ON 04/01/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12867744 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12695423.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12867744 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12695423.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FIEDLER, ROBERT ALLEN ON 04/02/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FIEDLER, ROBERT ALLEN ON 04/02/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FIEDLER, ROBERT ALLEN ON 04/02/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FIEDLER, ROBERT ALLEN ON 04/02/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY YARDI SYSTEMS, INC. ON 04/01/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY YARDI SYSTEMS, INC. ON 04/01/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12784417 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12611216.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12784417 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12611216.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY YARDI SYSTEMS, INC. ON 09/18/2020

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY YARDI SYSTEMS, INC. ON 09/18/2020

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: GRIFFIN; Department: N17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GRIFFIN; Department: N17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/23/2021 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketTHE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/23/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT N17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketTHE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/22/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT N17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/23/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/22/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DESTEFANO, CHRISTOPHER ON 07/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31041991 RECEIVED ON 07/22/2021 03:10:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1868142 RECEIVED ON 07/08/2021 04:03:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/16/2021 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N05 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FIEDLER, ROBERT ALLEN ON 07/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1753631 RECEIVED ON 07/22/2020 12:29:09 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12753659 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12579998.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1747390 RECEIVED ON 06/24/2020 04:38:09 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 06/24/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FIEDLER, ROBERT ALLEN ON 06/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FIEDLER, ROBERT ALLEN ON 06/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY FIEDLER, ROBERT ALLEN ON 06/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Yardi Systems Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VARTAZARIAN STEVEN R.