Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:19:03 (UTC).

RNR RECOVERY, INC. VS. HEALTH NET, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2017 RNR RECOVERY, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HEALTH NET, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

RNR RECOVERY, INC.

Reiner Nusbaum

CMRW, Inc.

Maxim Management Group, Inc.

People for People, LLC

Mahyar Mohases

Other and Claimant

CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC

Defendants and Others

CENTENE CORPORATION

HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

HEALTH NET, INC.

MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK, INC.

CMRW, Inc.

Maxim Management Group, Inc.

People for People, LLC

Mahyar Mohases

Reienr Nusbaum

CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC

Reiner Nusbaum

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC

SEMNAR & HARTMAN, LLP

Defendant and Other Attorneys

MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS, LLP

FitzGerald Yap Kreditor LLP

Daryoosh Khashayar

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

FitzGerald Yap Kreditor LLP

Daryoosh Khashayar

CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC

SEMNAR & HARTMAN, LLP

 

Court Documents

OBJECTION (TO PORTIONS OF DECLARATION OF KENNETH B. JULIAN, ESQ.) FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 02/14/2019

OBJECTION (TO PORTIONS OF DECLARATION OF KENNETH B. JULIAN, ESQ.) FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 02/14/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 02/14/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 02/14/2019

OPPOSITION (TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 02/14/2019

OPPOSITION (TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 02/14/2019

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND (FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/21/2018

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND (FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/21/2018

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 06/14/2019

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 06/14/2019

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 06/06/2019

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 06/06/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3799010 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3799010 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12559049 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12382933.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12559049 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12382933.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12539841 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12363660.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12539841 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12363660.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/27/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/27/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/21/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/21/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12473792 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12297474.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12473792 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12297474.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12205523 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12029243.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12205523 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12029243.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/27/2017

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/27/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/18/2017 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/18/2017 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (EXTENDING TIME) FILED BY HEALTH NET, INC.; HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK, INC.; CENTENE CORPORATION ON 05/16/2017

STIPULATION AND ORDER (EXTENDING TIME) FILED BY HEALTH NET, INC.; HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK, INC.; CENTENE CORPORATION ON 05/16/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 04/24/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 04/24/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 04/24/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 04/24/2017

133 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CMRW, INC.; MAXIM MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.; PEOPLE FOR PEOPLE, LLC; MOHASES, MAHYAR ON 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1651943 RECEIVED ON 08/05/2019 06:44:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT SCHEDULED FOR 09/26/2019 AT 02:00:00 PM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12597263 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12421362.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NUSBAUM, REINER ON 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION OF TAYLOR MARKS) FILED BY NUSBAUM, REINER ON 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY NUSBAUM, REINER ON 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY NUSBAUM, REINER ON 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1651108 RECEIVED ON 08/02/2019 10:20:07 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
229 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 04/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3537295 RECEIVED ON 04/24/2017 11:37:55 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIEN FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 04/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4711614 RECEIVED ON 04/19/2017 05:22:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 04/13/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12139485 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11963268.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 04/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 04/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY RNR RECOVERY, INC. ON 04/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4708720 RECEIVED ON 04/13/2017 04:35:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Maxim Management Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where RNR Recovery, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant