This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 10:35:04 (UTC).

RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC VS. STEVE MAROLDA

Case Summary

On 02/19/2016 RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against STEVE MAROLDA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC

Defendant

STEVE MAROLDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NUSSBAUM APC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 02/19/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 02/19/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 02/19/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 02/19/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 02/19/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 02/19/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 169 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 385.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11923279 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11747476.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 169 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 385.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11923279 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11747476.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 03/04/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 03/04/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 03/04/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 03/04/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 03/25/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 03/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 03/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 03/25/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (POSSESSION ONLY) FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 03/25/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (POSSESSION ONLY) FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 03/25/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 03/25/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 03/25/2016

WRIT (ISSUED 3/25/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/25/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 3/25/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/25/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11942355 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766530.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11942355 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766530.

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 09/21/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 09/21/2016

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 09/21/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11942355 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766530.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (ISSUED 3/25/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/25/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 03/25/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (POSSESSION ONLY) FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 03/25/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 03/25/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 03/25/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1312503 RECEIVED ON 03/25/2016 09:51:01 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 03/04/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 03/04/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4513001 RECEIVED ON 03/04/2016 01:01:19 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 169 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 385.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11923279 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11747476.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 02/19/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 02/19/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 02/19/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4506209 RECEIVED ON 02/19/2016 10:58:30 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less