This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:40 (UTC).

RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC VS. DAVID VALASQUEZ

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAVID VALASQUEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC

Defendant

DAVID VALASQUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN J. SIEBIG

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) (ORDER) RECEIVED ON 09/21/2016.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) (ORDER) RECEIVED ON 09/21/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY VALASQUEZ, DAVID ON 08/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY VALASQUEZ, DAVID ON 08/01/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 09/21/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 09/21/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER (ORDER TO ACCEPT COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) RECEIVED ON 09/21/2016.

DECLARATION - OTHER (ORDER TO ACCEPT COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) RECEIVED ON 09/21/2016.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 02/26/2016

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 09/21/2016.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 09/21/2016.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 10/21/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 10/21/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/16/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/16/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/19/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/19/2016 09:00:00 AM.

JUDGMENT FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 12/02/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 12/02/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2506491 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2506491 REJECTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/19/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/19/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016.

JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/02/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/02/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/21/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/21/2016 09:00:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 08/02/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 08/02/2016

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (CMC) FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 09/21/2016

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (CMC) FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 09/21/2016

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 12/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO ACCEPT COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 12/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/02/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2506491 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 11/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 11/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3441765 RECEIVED ON 08/02/2016 03:31:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY VALASQUEZ, DAVID ON 08/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3441269 RECEIVED ON 08/01/2016 04:30:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/19/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928267 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752485.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY RIF II - ORANGETHORPE, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1307129 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:26:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less