This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:12:55 (UTC).

RICHARD NELSON VS. STATER BROS. MARKETS

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 RICHARD NELSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STATER BROS MARKETS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARD NELSON

Defendant

STATER BROS. MARKETS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RITCHIE KLINKERT MCCALLION

Defendant Attorney

VARNER & BRANDT, LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY NELSON, RICHARD ON 01/29/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY NELSON, RICHARD ON 01/29/2014

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/07/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/07/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE), TRANSACTION NUMBER 11504581 IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00 VOIDED DUE TO METHOD OF PAYMENT CHANGED.

PAYMENT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE), TRANSACTION NUMBER 11504581 IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00 VOIDED DUE TO METHOD OF PAYMENT CHANGED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11510776 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11334565.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11510776 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11334565.

COMPLAINT FILED BY NELSON, RICHARD ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY NELSON, RICHARD ON 08/12/2013

CASE REASSIGNED TO WILLIAM CLASTER EFFECTIVE 01/06/2014.

CASE REASSIGNED TO WILLIAM CLASTER EFFECTIVE 01/06/2014.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430876 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254748.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430876 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254748.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY NELSON, RICHARD ON 11/14/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY NELSON, RICHARD ON 11/14/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NELSON, RICHARD ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NELSON, RICHARD ON 08/12/2013

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/07/2013 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/07/2013 08:30:00 AM.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY STATER BROS. MARKETS ON 12/09/2013

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY STATER BROS. MARKETS ON 12/09/2013

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MONROE, WILLIAM ON 08/12/2013.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MONROE, WILLIAM ON 08/12/2013.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NELSON, RICHARD ON 11/18/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NELSON, RICHARD ON 11/18/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11504679 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11328464.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11504679 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11328464.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NELSON, RICHARD ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NELSON, RICHARD ON 08/12/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STATER BROS. MARKETS ON 12/19/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STATER BROS. MARKETS ON 12/19/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11504581 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11328366.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11504581 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11328366.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY NELSON, RICHARD ON 01/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3109422 RECEIVED ON 01/29/2014 01:42:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/08/2014 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • THE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 07/28/2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/28/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE REASSIGNED TO C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 01/08/2014 AT 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2013
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B SCHEDULED FOR 12/03/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/03/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED SCHEDULED FOR 12/03/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/07/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MONROE, WILLIAM ON 08/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430876 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254748.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NELSON, RICHARD ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NELSON, RICHARD ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY NELSON, RICHARD ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462308 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 11:07:24 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less