This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:20:21 (UTC).

RICHARD HANSON VS LAURA HANSON

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 RICHARD HANSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LAURA HANSON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8289

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HANSON, RICHARD H

Respondent

HANSON, LAURA C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

THE LAW OFFICES OF MOIRA G. BOYLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2018
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 01/30/2018; Filing Party: HANSON, LAURA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 01/30/2018; Filing Party: HANSON, LAURA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 01/29/2018; Filing Party: HANSON, LAURA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/29/2018; Filing Party: HANSON, LAURA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/29/2018 PRELIM; Filing Party: HANSON, RICHARD H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/29/2018 PRELIM; Filing Party: HANSON, LAURA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 01/29/2018; Filing Party: HANSON, LAURA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 12/20/2017; Filing Party: HANSON, RICHARD H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 12/11/2017; Filing Party: HANSON, RICHARD H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 11/03/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: HANSON, LAURA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 11/03/2017; Filing Party: HANSON, LAURA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 11/03/2017; Filing Party: HANSON, LAURA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 11/03/2017; Filing Party: HANSON, LAURA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 11/03/2017; Filing Party: HANSON, LAURA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: HANSON, RICHARD H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: HANSON, RICHARD H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/10/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: HANSON, RICHARD H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • SUMMONS 10/10/2017; Filing Party: HANSON, RICHARD H

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.