This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 00:15:41 (UTC).

RICHARD ANTONE RUSSO VS. NEWPORT COAST SECURITIES

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 RICHARD ANTONE RUSSO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NEWPORT COAST SECURITIES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARD ANTONE RUSSO

Defendant

NEWPORT COAST SECURITIES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2014
  • PAYMENT RECEIPT# 11327716 WAS VOIDED DUE TO CHARGEBACK PER JV# 14006243 DATED 2/28/14. CHARGEBACK NOTICE IS NOT MAIL OUT BECAUSE PARTY ALREADY MADE A CHECK PAYMENT ON 11/6/13 WITH RECEIPT# 11316421.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • PAYMENT FOR OTHER TRUST, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11503931 IN THE AMOUNT OF 65.00 VOIDED DUE TO CHARGEBACK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • PAYMENT FOR OTHER TRUST, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11503931 IN THE AMOUNT OF 65.00 VOIDED DUE TO CHARGEBACK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR OTHER TRUST IN THE AMOUNT OF 65.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11503931 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11327716.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • PAYMENT FOR OTHER TRUST, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11502775 IN THE AMOUNT OF 65.00 VOIDED DUE TO METHOD OF PAYMENT CHANGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • PAYMENT FOR OTHER TRUST, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11502775 IN THE AMOUNT OF 65.00 VOIDED DUE TO METHOD OF PAYMENT CHANGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR OTHER TRUST IN THE AMOUNT OF 65.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11502775 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11326560.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000, 07 - CERTIFIED MAIL - SERVICE BY CLERK IN THE AMOUNT OF 65.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11492509 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11316421.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • PAYMENT FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000, 07 - CERTIFIED MAIL - SERVICE BY CLERK, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11429664 IN THE AMOUNT OF 65.00 VOIDED DUE TO CHARGEBACK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • PAYMENT FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000, 07 - CERTIFIED MAIL - SERVICE BY CLERK, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11429664 IN THE AMOUNT OF 65.00 VOIDED DUE TO CHARGEBACK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 10/10/2013 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK FILED BY RUSSO, RICHARD ANTONE SR ON 08/15/2013; Filing Party: RUSSO, RICHARD ANTONE SR ON 08/15/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/10/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000, 07 - CERTIFIED MAIL - SERVICE BY CLERK IN THE AMOUNT OF 65.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11429664 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11253536.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 348034 RECEIVED ON 08/10/2013 12:46:29 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY RUSSO, RICHARD ANTONE SR ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: RUSSO, RICHARD ANTONE SR ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • CERTIFIED MAIL STATEMENT FILED BY RUSSO, RICHARD ANTONE SR ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: RUSSO, RICHARD ANTONE SR ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less