This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 02:39:39 (UTC).

RHONDA ROBLES VS. FULLERTON SPAGHETTI RESTAURANT, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2018 RHONDA ROBLES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FULLERTON SPAGHETTI RESTAURANT, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RHONDA ROBLES

Defendants

FULLERTON SPAGHETTI RESTAURANT, INC.

OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAHMANI LAW, APC

Defendant Attorney

Law Office of Tracey Lazarus

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 04/26/2019

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 04/26/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/27/2019 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/27/2019 08:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12521047 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12344806.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12521047 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12344806.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 03/22/2019

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 03/22/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 03/22/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 03/22/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 03/12/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 03/12/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12513025 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12336744.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12513025 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12336744.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 02/15/2019

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 02/15/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12512303 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12336027.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12512303 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12336027.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 03/04/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 03/04/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 01/29/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 01/29/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 01/29/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 01/29/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/27/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/27/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 12/14/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 12/14/2018.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12470817 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12294516.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12470817 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12294516.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 12/14/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 12/14/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 12/14/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 12/14/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 12/14/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 12/14/2018

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING FILED BY OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 04/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4963580 RECEIVED ON 04/26/2019 05:29:01 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/27/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketTHE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/15/2019 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C33.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketTHE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 12/16/2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C33.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/15/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/16/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12521047 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12344806.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 03/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY OSF INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 03/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 01/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 01/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3753529 RECEIVED ON 01/29/2019 09:14:05 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/27/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 12/14/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12470817 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12294516.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 12/14/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 12/14/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ROBLES, RHONDA ON 12/14/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2742954 RECEIVED ON 12/14/2018 02:00:48 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less