This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:49:23 (UTC).

REYES MARQUEZ VS. GILBERTO BARENO

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 REYES MARQUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GILBERTO BARENO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEONOR GUEVARA

REYES MARQUEZ

Defendants

MARIA BARENO

GILBERTO BARENO

GILBERTO BARENO CEJA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF AMEER A. SHAH

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF ANDREW W. MACRAE

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MARQUEZ, REYES ON 07/10/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MARQUEZ, REYES ON 07/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY MARQUEZ, REYES; GUEVARA, LEONOR ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MARQUEZ, REYES; GUEVARA, LEONOR ON 02/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/23/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/23/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12133581 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11957386.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12133581 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11957386.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BARENO, MARIA; CEJA, GILBERTO BARENO ON 04/11/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BARENO, MARIA; CEJA, GILBERTO BARENO ON 04/11/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/23/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/23/2016 09:00:00 AM.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/03/2017

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/03/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GUEVARA, LEONOR; MARQUEZ, REYES ON 04/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GUEVARA, LEONOR; MARQUEZ, REYES ON 04/18/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY MARQUEZ, REYES; GUEVARA, LEONOR ON 07/14/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY MARQUEZ, REYES; GUEVARA, LEONOR ON 07/14/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K, 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 890.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11949392 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11773545.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K, 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 890.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11949392 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11773545.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARQUEZ, REYES; GUEVARA, LEONOR ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARQUEZ, REYES; GUEVARA, LEONOR ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARQUEZ, REYES; GUEVARA, LEONOR ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARQUEZ, REYES; GUEVARA, LEONOR ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928115 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752340.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928115 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752340.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY BARENO, MARIA ON 09/09/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY BARENO, MARIA ON 09/09/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BARENO, MARIA ON 09/09/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BARENO, MARIA ON 09/09/2016

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL) FILED BY GUEVARA, LEONOR; MARQUEZ, REYES ON 04/04/2017

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL) FILED BY GUEVARA, LEONOR; MARQUEZ, REYES ON 04/04/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GUEVARA, LEONOR; MARQUEZ, REYES ON 04/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GUEVARA, LEONOR; MARQUEZ, REYES ON 04/18/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY BARENO, MARIA; CEJA, GILBERTO BARENO ON 04/11/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY BARENO, MARIA; CEJA, GILBERTO BARENO ON 04/11/2016

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MARQUEZ, REYES ON 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4746082 RECEIVED ON 07/10/2017 12:03:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/28/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12133581 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11957386.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL) FILED BY GUEVARA, LEONOR; MARQUEZ, REYES ON 04/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2543752 RECEIVED ON 04/03/2017 12:42:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/23/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4534666 RECEIVED ON 04/18/2016 02:49:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K, 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 890.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11949392 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11773545.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY BARENO, MARIA; CEJA, GILBERTO BARENO ON 04/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BARENO, MARIA; CEJA, GILBERTO BARENO ON 04/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4531140 RECEIVED ON 04/11/2016 11:41:54 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928115 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752340.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARQUEZ, REYES; GUEVARA, LEONOR ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARQUEZ, REYES; GUEVARA, LEONOR ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MARQUEZ, REYES; GUEVARA, LEONOR ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446781 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 03:23:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.