This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/25/2022 at 16:55:14 (UTC).

RESNA C. DORIA VS. KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 RESNA C DORIA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Addison Doria

Ceanna Doria

Resna C. Doria

Richard Doria

Defendants

Kaiser Foundation Hospitals

Kaiser Permanente

Southern California Permanente Medical Group

Guardian Ad Litem

RESNA DORIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aitken Aitken & Cohn

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY DORIA, RESNA C.; DORIA, CEANNA; DORIA, ADDISON; DORIA, RICHARD ON 01/04/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY DORIA, RESNA C.; DORIA, CEANNA; DORIA, ADDISON; DORIA, RICHARD ON 01/04/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12990433 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12818352.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12990433 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12818352.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN W02 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN W02 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1942185 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1942185 REJECTED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DORIA, ADDISON; DORIA, CEANNA; DORIA, RESNA C.; DORIA, RICHARD ON 02/08/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DORIA, ADDISON; DORIA, CEANNA; DORIA, RESNA C.; DORIA, RICHARD ON 02/08/2022

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY DORIA, ADDISON ON 02/08/2022

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY DORIA, ADDISON ON 02/08/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DORIA, ADDISON; DORIA, CEANNA; DORIA, RESNA C.; DORIA, RICHARD ON 02/16/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DORIA, ADDISON; DORIA, CEANNA; DORIA, RESNA C.; DORIA, RICHARD ON 02/16/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DORIA, ADDISON; DORIA, CEANNA; DORIA, RESNA C.; DORIA, RICHARD ON 03/22/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DORIA, ADDISON; DORIA, CEANNA; DORIA, RESNA C.; DORIA, RICHARD ON 03/22/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SCOTT; Department: W02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31134538 RECEIVED ON 03/22/2022 11:03:58 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DORIA, ADDISON; DORIA, CEANNA; DORIA, RESNA C.; DORIA, RICHARD ON 03/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1952602 RECEIVED ON 02/16/2022 10:13:39 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DORIA, ADDISON; DORIA, CEANNA; DORIA, RESNA C.; DORIA, RICHARD ON 02/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41295525 RECEIVED ON 02/08/2022 09:41:47 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DORIA, ADDISON; DORIA, CEANNA; DORIA, RESNA C.; DORIA, RICHARD ON 02/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY DORIA, ADDISON ON 02/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDORIA, RESNA APPOINTED AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM CR .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1942185 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/30/2022 AT 02:00:00 PM IN W02 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31103624 RECEIVED ON 01/04/2022 02:39:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12990433 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12818352.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN W02 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DORIA, RESNA C.; DORIA, CEANNA; DORIA, ADDISON; DORIA, RICHARD ON 01/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 01/04/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant