This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:19:37 (UTC).

RENATO OCAMPO VS FRANCES OCAMPO

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 RENATO OCAMPO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FRANCES OCAMPO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8277

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OCAMPO, RENATO

Respondent

OCAMPO, FRANCES JANET JONES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2018
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 06/29/2018; Filing Party: OCAMPO, RENATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 06/29/2018; Filing Party: OCAMPO, RENATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 06/29/2018 PRELIMINARY AND FINAL; Filing Party: OCAMPO, RENATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 05/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 02/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 01/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 01/09/2018; Filing Party: OCAMPO, RENATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/09/2018; Filing Party: OCAMPO, RENATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 01/09/2018; Filing Party: OCAMPO, RENATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 12/05/2017; Filing Party: OCAMPO, RENATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 12/05/2017; Filing Party: OCAMPO, RENATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 12/05/2017; Filing Party: OCAMPO, RENATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 12/05/2017; Filing Party: OCAMPO, RENATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: OCAMPO, RENATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION 10/10/2017; Filing Party: OCAMPO, RENATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 10/10/2017; Filing Party: OCAMPO, RENATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • SUMMONS 10/10/2017; Filing Party: OCAMPO, RENATO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/10/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: OCAMPO, RENATO

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.