This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/22/2021 at 07:53:51 (UTC).

REIHANEH HOSSEINI VS. MICHAEL L. HORTON

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 REIHANEH HOSSEINI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MICHAEL L HORTON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reihaneh Hosseini

Defendants

Barbara S. Horton

Michael L. Horton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter C. Wittlin

 

Court Documents

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY HOSSEINI, REIHANEH ON 04/07/2021

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY HOSSEINI, REIHANEH ON 04/07/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12865576 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12693255.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12865576 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12693255.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HOSSEINI, REIHANEH ON 03/29/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HOSSEINI, REIHANEH ON 03/29/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HOSSEINI, REIHANEH ON 03/29/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HOSSEINI, REIHANEH ON 03/29/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY HOSSEINI, REIHANEH ON 03/29/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY HOSSEINI, REIHANEH ON 03/29/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41179002 RECEIVED ON 04/07/2021 06:19:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY HOSSEINI, REIHANEH ON 04/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12865576 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12693255.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41175009 RECEIVED ON 03/29/2021 06:26:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 03/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HOSSEINI, REIHANEH ON 03/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HOSSEINI, REIHANEH ON 03/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HOSSEINI, REIHANEH ON 03/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter C. Wittlin