This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:23 (UTC).

REGGIO AT RANCHO NIGUEL ASSOCIATION VS. AIDE ALBA DAYFALLAH

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 REGGIO AT RANCHO NIGUEL ASSOCIATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AIDE ALBA DAYFALLAH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGGIO AT RANCHO NIGUEL ASSO

Defendant

AIDE ALBA DAYFALLAH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY REGGIO AT RANCHO NIGUEL ASSOCIATION ON 09/29/2016; Filing Party: REGGIO AT RANCHO NIGU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 09/29/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY REGGIO AT RANCHO NIGUEL ASSOCIATION ON 09/23/2016; Filing Party: REGGIO AT RANCHO NIGUEL ASSOCIATION ON 09/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/29/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY REGGIO AT RANCHO NIGUEL ASSOCIATION FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11926795 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/02/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY REGGIO AT RANCHO NIGUEL ASSOCIATION ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: REGGIO AT RANCHO NIGUEL ASSOCIATION ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.