This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/04/2022 at 03:47:13 (UTC).

RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS. ENSIGN SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

Recovery Associates, LLC

Remedy Analytics, Inc.

Defendant and Other

Ensign Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Defendant and Other Attorney

Miller Barondess, LLP

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/02/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/02/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/02/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/02/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/02/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/02/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/02/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/02/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/02/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/02/2022

APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/02/2022

APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/02/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 164 - APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13044117 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12872133.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 164 - APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13044117 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12872133.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/04/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/04/2022

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. ON 05/04/2022

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. ON 05/04/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13045415 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12873431.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13045415 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12873431.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONE LEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13045425 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12873441.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONE LEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13045425 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12873441.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/10/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/10/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/10/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/10/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/10/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/10/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/10/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/10/2022

APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/10/2022

APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/10/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/10/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/10/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/10/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/10/2022

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: LEE; Department: W15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE; Judge: LEE; Department: W15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/02/2022 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1996082 RECEIVED ON 06/02/2022 05:13:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21161929 RECEIVED ON 05/20/2022 02:09:41 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41337453 RECEIVED ON 05/20/2022 02:11:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1991972 RECEIVED ON 05/23/2022 03:53:21 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. ON 05/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ENSIGN SERVICES, INC. ON 05/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/02/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31134870 RECEIVED ON 03/22/2022 05:16:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31134560 RECEIVED ON 03/22/2022 11:31:46 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 03/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13024524 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12852494.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 03/22/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/25/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 03/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 03/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Recovery Associates is a litigant

Latest cases where ENSIGN SERVICES INC is a litigant