This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/03/2019 at 06:44:57 (UTC).

RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC VS. HILL RANCH PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HILL RANCH PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raymond Village, LLC

Defendants

North Orange County Community College District

Hill Ranch Partnership

NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 09/20/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 09/20/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 09/20/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 09/20/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 09/20/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 09/20/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12626869 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12451368.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12626869 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12451368.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 09/20/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 09/20/2019.

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 10/01/2019

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 10/01/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 10/03/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 10/03/2019

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 10/18/2019

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 10/18/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/27/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/27/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 11/27/2019

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 11/27/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3861356 RECEIVED ON 11/27/2019 09:13:20 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/27/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1678593 RECEIVED ON 10/18/2019 01:27:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2844479 RECEIVED ON 10/03/2019 09:17:03 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1672317 RECEIVED ON 10/01/2019 04:59:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 09/20/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12626869 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12451368.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY RAYMOND VILLAGE, LLC ON 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3837077 RECEIVED ON 09/20/2019 04:32:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE is a litigant