Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/19/2021 at 06:54:28 (UTC).

RAY Y DIAB VS. COUNTRYWIDE BANK

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 RAY Y DIAB filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against COUNTRYWIDE BANK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ray Y Diab

Defendants

Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Successor Trustee to Citibank, N.A., as Trustee for Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Trust 2007-AR3 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-AR3

Bank of America

Nationstar Mortgage, LLC

Barrett Daffin Frappier, Treder & Weiss

Countrywide Bank

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.

Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

Severson & Werson

Barret Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP

Other Attorneys

TROUTMAN SANDERS, LLP

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 02/11/2021 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 02/11/2021 01:30:00 PM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 02/16/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 02/16/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/12/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/12/2021

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/25/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/25/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12836422 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12663841.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12836422 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12663841.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC; WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE TO CITIBANK, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II TRUST 2007-AR3 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007-AR3 ON 01/15/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC; WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE TO CITIBANK, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II TRUST 2007-AR3 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007-AR3 ON 01/15/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12836419 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12663838.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12836419 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12663838.

DEMURRER FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 01/11/2021

DEMURRER FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 01/11/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12832006 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12659356.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12832006 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12659356.

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. ON 01/11/2021

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. ON 01/11/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION) SUBMITTED BY DIAB, RAY Y REJECTED ON 01/06/2021.

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION) SUBMITTED BY DIAB, RAY Y REJECTED ON 01/06/2021.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY DIAB, RAY Y ON 12/16/2020

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY DIAB, RAY Y ON 12/16/2020

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY DIAB, RAY Y ON 12/15/2020

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY DIAB, RAY Y ON 12/15/2020

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY DIAB, RAY Y ON 12/16/2020

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY DIAB, RAY Y ON 12/16/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DIAB, RAY Y ON 12/07/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DIAB, RAY Y ON 12/07/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY DIAB, RAY Y ON 12/07/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY DIAB, RAY Y ON 12/07/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DIAP, ALEXANDRA FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12817413 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12644492.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DIAP, ALEXANDRA FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12817413 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12644492.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: SALTER; Department: C22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1812317 RECEIVED ON 02/12/2021 08:50:22 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 02/11/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 02/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3980602 RECEIVED ON 02/12/2021 08:50:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/25/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1801329 RECEIVED ON 01/08/2021 01:49:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12836422 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12663841.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY DIAB, RAY Y ON 12/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY DIAB, RAY Y ON 12/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY DIAB, RAY Y ON 12/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION) RECEIVED ON 12/16/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY DIAB, RAY Y ON 12/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DIAP, ALEXANDRA FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12817413 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12644492.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 12/07/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DIAB, RAY Y ON 12/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DIAB, RAY Y ON 12/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DIAB, RAY Y ON 12/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY, BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1 is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant