This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:36 (UTC).

RANCHO NIGUEL MASTER C/A VS. ANGELICA GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 RANCHO NIGUEL MASTER C/A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANGELICA GOMEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RANCHO NIGUEL MASTER C/A

Defendant

ANGELICA GOMEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY RANCHO NIGUEL MASTER C/A ON 09/29/2016; Filing Party: RANCHO NIGUEL MASTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 09/29/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY GOMEZ, ANGELICA ON 09/26/2016; Filing Party: GOMEZ, ANGELICA ON 09/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY RANCHO NIGUEL MASTER C/A ON 09/23/2016; Filing Party: RANCHO NIGUEL MASTER C/A ON 09/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/29/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • DISBURSEMENT ON TRUST 322846 TO RANCHO NIGUEL MASTER C-A ISSUED IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00 DUE TO OTHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RANCHO NIGUEL MASTER C-A FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000, OVERAGE TRUST > $10 IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11926803 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751024.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/02/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY RANCHO NIGUEL MASTER C/A ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: RANCHO NIGUEL MASTER C/A ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.