This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:13:37 (UTC).

RAMIREZ VS. W/S PACKAGING GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 RAMIREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against W/S PACKAGING GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARLOS RAMIREZ

Defendants

W/S PACKAGING GROUP, INC., A WISCONSIN

RAY CABRERA

W/S PACKAGING GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLADY WEINREB LAW GROUP LLP

Defendant Attorneys

FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP

FISHER & PHILLIPS, LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11482211 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11306123.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11482211 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11306123.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 379199 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 379199 REJECTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CABRERA, RAY; W/S PACKAGING GROUP, INC. ON 05/19/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CABRERA, RAY; W/S PACKAGING GROUP, INC. ON 05/19/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11484392 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11308304.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11484392 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11308304.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY W/S PACKAGING GROUP, INC., A WISCONSIN CORPORATION ON 10/02/2013

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY W/S PACKAGING GROUP, INC., A WISCONSIN CORPORATION ON 10/02/2013

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/25/2014.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/25/2014.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RAMIREZ, CARLOS ON 01/03/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RAMIREZ, CARLOS ON 01/03/2014

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RAMIREZ, CARLOS ON 08/14/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RAMIREZ, CARLOS ON 08/14/2013

AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY CABRERA, RAY ON 02/10/2014

AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY CABRERA, RAY ON 02/10/2014

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/10/2014

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/10/2014

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY W/S PACKAGING GROUP, INC. ON 07/10/2014

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY W/S PACKAGING GROUP, INC. ON 07/10/2014

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CABRERA, RAY ON 10/08/2013

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CABRERA, RAY ON 10/08/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CABRERA, RAY; W/S PACKAGING GROUP, INC. ON 12/31/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CABRERA, RAY; W/S PACKAGING GROUP, INC. ON 12/31/2013

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 08/25/2014 03:55:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 08/25/2014 03:55:00 PM.

DEMURRER TO ANSWER FILED BY RAMIREZ, CARLOS ON 10/17/2013

DEMURRER TO ANSWER FILED BY RAMIREZ, CARLOS ON 10/17/2013

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 349251 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 349251 REJECTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CABRERA, RAY; W/S PACKAGING GROUP, INC. ON 02/11/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CABRERA, RAY; W/S PACKAGING GROUP, INC. ON 02/11/2014

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RAMIREZ, CARLOS ON 10/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3196818 RECEIVED ON 10/01/2014 12:58:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 09/12/2014 02:06:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/29/2014 AT 08:45 AM IN DEPARTMENT C13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 10/29/2014 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY RAMIREZ, CARLOS ON 09/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3188947 RECEIVED ON 09/11/2014 12:26:25 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RAMIREZ, CARLOS ON 08/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1108824 RECEIVED ON 08/28/2013 11:07:14 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RAMIREZ, CARLOS ON 08/14/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2271553 RECEIVED ON 08/14/2013 03:34:25 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 349251 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 08/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431783 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255655.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RAMIREZ, CARLOS ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY RAMIREZ, CARLOS ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462778 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 11:59:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less