This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/25/2019 at 12:11:32 (UTC).

RAMIREZ V RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 RAMIREZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HONER, SHERRI L.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7480

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

HONER, SHERRI L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christine Ramirez

Petitioner

RAMIREZ, CHRISTINE

Defendant

Rudolph Ramirez

Respondent

RAMIREZ, RUDOLPH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2013
  • WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 12/24/2013 11:47:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, CHRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 12/24/2013 09:43:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, CHRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 11/26/2013 12:03:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, CHRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • JUDGMENT 11/26/2013 12:02:00 # Pages:24; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, CHRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 11/26/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 11/25/2013 14:54:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, CHRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 11/25/2013 14:54:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, CHRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 11/25/2013 14:54:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, RUDOLPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 11/25/2013 14:54:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, CHRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • APPEARANCE, STIPULATION & WAIVERS (CONVERSION) 11/07/2013 15:38:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, CHRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • MINUTE ORDER - OFF CALENDAR 10/15/2013 08:30:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • HEARING - RFO - SPOUSAL SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 09/16/2013 16:00:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, CHRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 09/11/2013 11:51:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, CHRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 08/28/2013 14:04:00 # Pages:6; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, CHRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • RFO - SPOUSAL SUPPORT 08/28/2013 08:59:00 # Pages:5; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, CHRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/12/2013 12:02:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, CHRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SUMMONS 08/12/2013 12:02:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, CHRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 08/12/2013 12:02:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: RAMIREZ, CHRISTINE

    Read MoreRead Less