This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:20:24 (UTC).

RAJ GURSAHANI VS THILLANAGIE GURSAHANI

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 RAJ GURSAHANI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against THILLANAGIE GURSAHANI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1711

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GURSAHANI, RAJ

Respondent

GURSAHANI, THILLANAGIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CLERK 07/22/2016; Filing Party: GURSAHANI, THILLANAGIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 07/18/2016; Filing Party: GURSAHANI, RAJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 07/18/2016; Filing Party: GURSAHANI, RAJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • JUDGMENT - DEFAULT - NO HEARING 07/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 07/11/2016; Filing Party: GURSAHANI, RAJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 07/07/2016; Filing Party: GURSAHANI, RAJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - POSTING 06/24/2016; Filing Party: GURSAHANI, RAJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - POSTING 06/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - POSTING 06/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - POSTING 06/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2016
  • ORDER - PUBLICATION OR POSTING 04/28/2016; Filing Party: GURSAHANI, RAJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 04/27/2016; Filing Party: GURSAHANI, RAJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • ORDER - PUBLICATION OR POSTING 04/19/2016; Filing Party: GURSAHANI, RAJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • APPLICATION - PUBLICATION / POSTING 04/19/2016 Amount:$20.00; Filing Party: GURSAHANI, RAJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 02/26/2016; Filing Party: GURSAHANI, RAJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 02/26/2016; Filing Party: GURSAHANI, RAJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: GURSAHANI, RAJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: GURSAHANI, RAJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: GURSAHANI, RAJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 02/26/2016; Filing Party: GURSAHANI, RAJ

    Read MoreRead Less