This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:49:25 (UTC).

RAINTREE REALTY, LLC VS. ANIMAL CRACKERS, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 RAINTREE REALTY, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against ANIMAL CRACKERS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAINTREE REALTY, LLC

Defendant

ANIMAL CRACKERS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLS LAW GROUP APC

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 04/22/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 04/22/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 04/05/2016) FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 03/30/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 04/05/2016) FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 03/30/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11946326 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11770481.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11946326 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11770481.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 03/23/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 03/23/2016

WRIT (ISSUED 04/05/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/30/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 04/05/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/30/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927537 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751762.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927537 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751762.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 03/23/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 03/23/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 02/26/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 03/30/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 03/30/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 04/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11946326 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11770481.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 04/05/2016) FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 03/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 04/05/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/30/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 03/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4525798 RECEIVED ON 03/30/2016 03:25:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 03/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 03/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4521986 RECEIVED ON 03/23/2016 02:53:41 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927537 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751762.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY RAINTREE REALTY, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385377 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 03:38:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less