This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/18/2020 at 06:55:28 (UTC).

RAIN BULLARD VS. HOWARD BRIAN HERDEG

Case Summary

On 11/05/2019 RAIN BULLARD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HOWARD BRIAN HERDEG. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rain Bullard

Defendants

Debra S. Herdeg

Howard Brian Herdeg III

Nicholas Lagattuta

Bullock Russell Real Estate Services

John Ybarra

HOWARD BRIAN HERDEG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Lee E. Burrows, APC

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/26/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/26/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BULLARD, RAIN ON 11/07/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BULLARD, RAIN ON 11/07/2019

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BAUER, RONALD ON 11/05/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BAUER, RONALD ON 11/05/2019.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12654339 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12478958.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12654339 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12478958.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BULLARD, RAIN ON 11/05/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BULLARD, RAIN ON 11/05/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY BULLARD, RAIN ON 11/05/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY BULLARD, RAIN ON 11/05/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/26/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BULLARD, RAIN ON 11/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2857419 RECEIVED ON 11/07/2019 01:27:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BAUER, RONALD ON 11/05/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12654339 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12478958.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BULLARD, RAIN ON 11/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY BULLARD, RAIN ON 11/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1685011 RECEIVED ON 11/05/2019 07:46:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AGENT ALLIANCE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant