This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/06/2023 at 03:44:56 (UTC).

R. H. VS. BIG BROTHERS BIG SISTERS OF ORANGE COUNTY AND THE INLAND EMPIRE, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 R H filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BIG BROTHERS BIG SISTERS OF ORANGE COUNTY AND THE INLAND EMPIRE, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R. H.

Defendant

Big Brothers Big Sisters Of Orange County And The Inland Empire, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Herman Law

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY H., R. ON 12/22/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY H., R. ON 12/22/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY H., R. ON 12/22/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY H., R. ON 12/22/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY H., R. ON 12/22/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY H., R. ON 12/22/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13156444 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12984541.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13156444 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12984541.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/03/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/03/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/25/2023 03:33:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/25/2023 03:33:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: STRICKROTH; Department: C15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/25/2023 03:33:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 07/17/2023 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/03/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13156444 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12984541.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11080397 RECEIVED ON 12/22/2022 01:17:36 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER STRICKROTH, MICHAEL ON 12/22/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY H., R. ON 12/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY H., R. ON 12/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY H., R. ON 12/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less