This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/25/2019 at 11:04:15 (UTC).

QUINTANILLA V QUINTANILLA

Case Summary

On 07/29/2013 QUINTANILLA filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against QUINTANILLA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7049

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

QUINTANILLA, MARIO

Respondent

QUINTANILLA, VERONICA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2015
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 01/07/2015 16:17:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: QUINTANILLA, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • JUDGMENT 01/07/2015 12:11:00 # Pages:8; Filing Party: QUINTANILLA, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 01/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 12/04/2014 10:25:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: QUINTANILLA, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 12/04/2014 10:25:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: QUINTANILLA, MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 12/04/2014 10:26:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: QUINTANILLA, MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/20/2014 16:29:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: QUINTANILLA, MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/20/2014 16:29:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: QUINTANILLA, MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 10/20/2014 16:28:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: QUINTANILLA, MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 10/20/2014 16:28:00 # Pages:8; Filing Party: QUINTANILLA, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 02/05/2014 14:09:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: QUINTANILLA, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 01/03/2014 16:04:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: QUINTANILLA, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION 01/03/2014 16:04:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: QUINTANILLA, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 01/03/2014 16:04:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: QUINTANILLA, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • CONFERENCE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • NOTICE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE 12/05/2013 13:41:00 GENERATED BY THE 100 - 120 DAY PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 08/27/2013 12:24:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: QUINTANILLA, MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 07/29/2013 16:12:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: QUINTANILLA, MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • SUMMONS 07/29/2013 16:12:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: QUINTANILLA, MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • PETITION - LEGAL SEPARATION 07/29/2013 16:12:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: QUINTANILLA, MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less