Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/25/2021 at 06:56:18 (UTC).

QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. VS. KATHLEEN ROBERTS

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against KATHLEEN ROBERTS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quinn Rental Services, Inc.

Defendant

Kathleen Roberts

Interested Parties

RS Real Estate Plus

Raafat Salem

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Raymond A. Policar

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 06/14/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 06/14/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING (NON-UD) FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 06/14/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING (NON-UD) FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 06/14/2021

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/08/2021

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/08/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 06/08/2021 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 06/08/2021 01:30:00 PM.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/08/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/08/2021

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 06/08/2021

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 06/08/2021

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 06/07/2021

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 06/07/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY RS REAL ESTATE PLUS; SALEM, RAAFAT ON 06/04/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY RS REAL ESTATE PLUS; SALEM, RAAFAT ON 06/04/2021

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 06/04/2021

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 06/04/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12894994 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12722789.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12894994 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12722789.

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 05/28/2021

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 05/28/2021

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 05/28/2021

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 05/28/2021

APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2021 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2021 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 04/12/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 04/12/2021

FOREIGN ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 04/12/2021

FOREIGN ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 04/12/2021

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • HearingDescription: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SALE OF DWELLING; Judge: SUPERVISING; Department: C12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 06/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31027009 RECEIVED ON 06/14/2021 02:06:42 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING (NON-UD) FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 06/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21029950 RECEIVED ON 06/14/2021 02:06:42 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31024520 RECEIVED ON 06/08/2021 09:50:07 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 06/08/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SALE OF DWELLING IS SCHEDULED FOR 07/22/2021 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT C12.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketEX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 06/08/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12894994 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12722789.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31021078 RECEIVED ON 05/28/2021 08:08:33 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 05/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 05/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2021 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41180362 RECEIVED ON 04/12/2021 10:57:32 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SUPERVISING ON 04/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 04/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFOREIGN ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC. ON 04/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP. is a litigant