This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:07 (UTC).

QUIJANO VS. PERFORMANCE CONTRACTING GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 QUIJANO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PERFORMANCE CONTRACTING GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATTY QUIJANO

Defendant

PERFORMANCE CONTRACTING GROUP, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KESLUK, SILVERSTEIN & JACOB, P. C

Defendant Attorney

OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, PC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY QUIJANO, PATTY ON 04/18/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY QUIJANO, PATTY ON 04/18/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928288 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752506.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928288 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752506.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/08/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/08/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUIJANO, PATTY ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUIJANO, PATTY ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY QUIJANO, PATTY ON 04/06/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY QUIJANO, PATTY ON 04/06/2016

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY PERFORMANCE CONTRACTING GROUP, INC ON 04/13/2016

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY PERFORMANCE CONTRACTING GROUP, INC ON 04/13/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY QUIJANO, PATTY ON 03/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY QUIJANO, PATTY ON 03/17/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUIJANO, PATTY ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUIJANO, PATTY ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11953169 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11777334.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11953169 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11777334.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/19/2016 01:46:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/19/2016 01:46:00 PM.

COMPLAINT FILED BY QUIJANO, PATTY ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY QUIJANO, PATTY ON 02/26/2016

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 02/26/2016.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/19/2016 01:46:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • THE CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE OMNIBUS CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO OMNI EFFECTIVE 04/13/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY QUIJANO, PATTY ON 04/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4534561 RECEIVED ON 04/18/2016 12:58:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11953169 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11777334.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY PERFORMANCE CONTRACTING GROUP, INC ON 04/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4532785 RECEIVED ON 04/13/2016 04:31:25 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY QUIJANO, PATTY ON 04/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2453243 RECEIVED ON 04/06/2016 06:53:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/08/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY QUIJANO, PATTY ON 03/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1310436 RECEIVED ON 03/17/2016 10:15:13 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928288 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752506.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUIJANO, PATTY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUIJANO, PATTY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY QUIJANO, PATTY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509967 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 08:01:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.