This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 08:07:45 (UTC).

QUICK BRIDGE FUNDING LLC. VS. REMNANT CONSTRUCTION LLC

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 QUICK BRIDGE FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against REMNANT CONSTRUCTION LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quick Bridge Funding LLC.

Defendants

Remnant Construction LLC

Sheldon Norris

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James E. Hawley

Jennifer E. Duty

Tara Muren

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY QUICK BRIDGE FUNDING LLC. ON 09/28/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY QUICK BRIDGE FUNDING LLC. ON 09/28/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUICK BRIDGE FUNDING LLC. ON 09/28/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUICK BRIDGE FUNDING LLC. ON 09/28/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUICK BRIDGE FUNDING LLC. ON 09/28/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUICK BRIDGE FUNDING LLC. ON 09/28/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12950382 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12778287.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12950382 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12778287.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/03/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/03/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY QUICK BRIDGE FUNDING LLC. ON 10/14/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY QUICK BRIDGE FUNDING LLC. ON 10/14/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY QUICK BRIDGE FUNDING LLC. ON 10/14/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY QUICK BRIDGE FUNDING LLC. ON 10/14/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SALTER; Department: N06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY QUICK BRIDGE FUNDING LLC. ON 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41252265 RECEIVED ON 10/14/2021 12:28:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY QUICK BRIDGE FUNDING LLC. ON 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31074232 RECEIVED ON 10/14/2021 12:26:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/03/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12950382 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12778287.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1899597 RECEIVED ON 09/28/2021 02:22:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 09/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUICK BRIDGE FUNDING LLC. ON 09/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUICK BRIDGE FUNDING LLC. ON 09/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY QUICK BRIDGE FUNDING LLC. ON 09/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUICK BRIDGE FUNDING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer E. Duty

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James E. Hawley