This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:13:06 (UTC).

QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. VS. ANDRES NAVARRETE

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANDRES NAVARRETE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC.

Defendants

ANDRES NAVARRETE

EMMA MENESES

KAREN NAVARRETE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KEITH LEVEY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

WRIT (ISSUED 12/3/13) RECEIVED ON 11/22/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED 12/3/13) RECEIVED ON 11/22/2013.

JUDGMENT FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/12/2013

JUDGMENT FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11504728 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11328513.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11504728 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11328513.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/22/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/22/2013

WRIT (ISSUED 12/03/2013) RECEIVED ON 11/22/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED 12/03/2013) RECEIVED ON 11/22/2013.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 08/12/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND COURT JUDGMENT PACKAGE) FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND COURT JUDGMENT PACKAGE) FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER (AND ORDER) FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER (AND ORDER) FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/12/2013

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 12/02/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11504872 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11328657.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 12/3/13) RECEIVED ON 11/22/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/22/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2293979 RECEIVED ON 11/22/2013 12:21:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11504728 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11328513.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 12/03/2013) RECEIVED ON 11/22/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4111664 RECEIVED ON 11/22/2013 12:28:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND COURT JUDGMENT PACKAGE) FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 11/07/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 380189 RECEIVED ON 11/07/2013 09:39:13 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY QUALITY ACCEPTANCE LLC. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462371 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 12:00:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less