This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/12/2023 at 03:52:35 (UTC).

P.W. STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL, INC. VS. ALICIA MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 P W STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALICIA MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

P.W. STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL,

Defendant

ALICIA MARTINEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 11/30/2022 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE (EXHIBITS) SUBMITTED BY P.W. STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL, INC. REJECTED ON 11/09/2022.; Filing Party: DENCE (EXHIBITS) SUBMITTED BY P.W. STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL, INC. REJECTED ON 11/

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY P.W. STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL, INC. ON 11/07/2022; Filing Party: P.W. STEPHENS ENVIRON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY P.W. STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL, INC. ON 11/04/2022; Filing Party: P.W. STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL, INC. ON 11/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY P.W. STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL, INC. FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13119560 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12947607.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/30/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY P.W. STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL, INC. ON 10/11/2022; Filing Party: P.W. STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL, INC. ON 10/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less