This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:10 (UTC).

PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC VS. CHARLEY C. HOLTON

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHARLEY C HOLTON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC

Defendants

SUMMER C. HOLTON

CHARLEY C. HOLTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/24/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/24/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/07/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/07/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927395 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751620.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927395 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751620.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 02/26/2016

JUDGMENT (PURSUANT TO STIPULATION) FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/23/2016

JUDGMENT (PURSUANT TO STIPULATION) FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/23/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 04/15/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 04/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/08/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/08/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/08/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/08/2016

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/23/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/23/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11941833 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766017.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11941833 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766017.

WRIT (ISSUED 3/24/16) RECEIVED ON 03/24/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 3/24/16) RECEIVED ON 03/24/2016.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HOLTON, CHARLEY C.; HOLTON, SUMMER C. ON 03/07/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HOLTON, CHARLEY C.; HOLTON, SUMMER C. ON 03/07/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/07/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/07/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/08/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/08/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 03/23/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 03/23/2016 09:00:00 AM.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 04/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11941833 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 3/24/16) RECEIVED ON 03/24/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3395184 RECEIVED ON 03/24/2016 02:05:42 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT (PURSUANT TO STIPULATION) FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 03/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 03/23/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/23/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY HOLTON, SUMMER C. ON 03/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • HOLTON, CHARLEY C. REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 03/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY HOLTON, CHARLEY C. ON 03/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927395 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751620.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY PURE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446731 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 02:07:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.